CT SB00197 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To delay the implementation of a mandate on municipalities and school districts.
Title
An Act Concerning In-school Suspensions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |
2010-03-30 | File Number 194 | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Calendar Number 147 | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |