CT SB00193 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-19 - House Calendar Number 418
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-19 - House Calendar Number 418
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require disclosure of any fees charged by an insurer or agent of such insurer for the processing of premium payments.
Title
An Act Concerning Disclosure Of Fees For The Processing Of Insurance Premium Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 121 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 418 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 270 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 207 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |