CT SB00181 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require any business organization receiving financial assistance from a state economic development entity to pay the standard wage to certain employees and require the business organization's contractors to pay the prevailing wage to his or her employees.
Title
An Act Requiring The Standard And Prevailing Wage Be Paid To Certain Employees Of Employers Who Received Financial Assistance From State Economic Development Entities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Fonfara [D] | House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Rep. Roland Lemar [D] | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] |
Sen. Rick Lopes [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Rep. Hector Robles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce | |
2012-03-28 | File Number 154 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Calendar Number 136 | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |