CT SB00178 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the applicable percentage of the earned income tax credit to thirty per cent.
Title
An Act Increasing The Applicable Percentage Of The Earned Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
House Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Quentin Williams [D] | Rep. Christine Palm [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |