CT SB00171 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a revolving loan account to assist certain elderly homeowners who have been delinquent on property tax payments.
Title
An Act Establishing A Revolving Loan Account To Assist Elderly Homeowners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-24 | Senate | File Number 118 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 110 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |