CT SB00171 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical revisions to the education and early childhood statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Technical Revisions To The Education And Early Childhood Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |