CT SB00168 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 89
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 89
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Developmental Services regarding group home licensing visits.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Developmental Services' Recommendations Regarding Group Home Licensing Visits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | File Number 89 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 73 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |