CT SB00156 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a state-administered revolving loan fund to assist elderly homeowners facing financial distress.
Title
An Act Establishing A Revolving Loan Fund To Assist Elderly Homeowners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |