CT SB00146 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical revisions to the public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Office's Recommendations Regarding Revisions To The Public Health Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |