CT SB00140 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the next study of the effect of legalized gambling by January 1, 2023.
Title
An Act Concerning Studies Of The Effect Of Legalized Gambling In The State.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Rep. Maria Horn [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-28 | Senate | File Number 137 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 124 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |