CT SB00131 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the data reported by the working group on behavioral health utilization and extend the report date.
Title
An Act Concerning The Working Group On Behavioral Health Utilization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 (Y: 118 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 272 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 272 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 16-158 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 554 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2016-03-22 | Senate | File Number 122 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 144 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |