CT SB00130 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To help fund the Second Chance Large Animal Rehabilitation Program of the Department of Agriculture.
Title
An Act Establishing A Surcharge On Animal Adoption Fees To Fund The Second Chance Large Animal Rehabilitation Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 Motion to PT (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 8873 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | File Number 773 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/17 5:00 PM |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | Senate | File Number 31 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 66 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |