CT SB00126 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - File Number 108
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - File Number 108
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Public Health to identify chemicals potentially harmful to children and report to the public health committee concerning such chemicals.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Exposure To Chemicals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | File Number 108 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 111 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |