CT SB00125 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical changes to streamline the Department of Consumer Protection's licensing and enforcement statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Department Of Consumer Protection Licensing And Enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |