CT SB00123 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Public Hearing 03/22
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Public Hearing 03/22
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To repeal the risk reduction credit program.
Title
An Act Repealing The Risk Reduction Credit Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Petition to Draft Pursuant to Joint Rule 11 02/26 |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |