CT SB00115 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to identify residents with unmet needs based on unpaid water utility bills.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program To Identify Residents With Unmet Needs Based On Unpaid Water Utility Bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |