CT SB00108 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for registration and equipment standards for neighborhood electric vehicles and to permit their operation on highways with posted speed limits of thirty-five miles per hour or less.
Title
An Act Concerning Registration And Use Of Certain Low-speed Neighborhood Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Transportation |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 269 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 197 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |