CT SB00105 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To give municipalities more time to receive and process rental rebate applications.
Title
An Act Concerning The Rental Rebate Application Period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 111 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-15 | Public Act 12-69 | |
2012-05-08 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-08 | House Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-24 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-18 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 320 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Passed | |
2012-03-07 | File Number 16 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Calendar Number 57 | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-02-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-02-24 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |