CT SB00091 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/20 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/20 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection to establish and administer a program to provide free swimming lessons to individuals under the age of eighteen.
Title
An Act Concerning A Program To Provide Free Swimming Lessons To Individuals Under The Age Of Eighteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/20 10:00 AM |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |