CT SB00075 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To improve the behavioral and mental health services provided to youth in the custody of the Department of Children and Families and the Department of Correction by requiring such departments to limit instances of seclusion and restraint to individuals twenty years of age and older, to study and report upon youths held in secure detention and correctional facilities and to adopt certain performance-based standards for such facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning Detained Youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 289 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 271 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 275 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 271 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 275 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-186 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 552 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5546 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-14 | Senate | File Number 33 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 82 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 10:00 AM |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |