CT SB00067 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - House Calendar Number 458
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - House Calendar Number 458
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit participants in the Charter Oak Health Plan to exceed established annual benefit limits to obtain coverage for treatment that is medically necessary.
Title
An Act Concerning Annual Benefits Available Under The Charter Oak Health Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | House Calendar Number 458 | |
2010-04-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-29 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-16 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 236 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Calendar Number 179 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |