CT SB00064 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Public Hearing 02/07
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Public Hearing 02/07
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent homeowners who have roofs, siding or windows replaced under a warranty from incurring the labor costs associated with such replacement.
Title
An Act Concerning Roofing, Window And Siding Consumer Warranties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00064&which_year=2017 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/s/2017SB-00064-R00-SB.htm |