CT SB00063 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - House Calendar Number 313
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - House Calendar Number 313
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish firm timelines for the issuance of awards in cases before the State Board of Mediation and Arbitration and the State Board of Labor Relations.
Title
An Act Concerning Timelines For Arbitration Awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 92 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 313 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-03-18 | Senate | File Number 29 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 69 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |