CT SB00044 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study children's safety within the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2014-03-25 | Senate | File Number 103 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 96 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |