CT SB00016 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit limits on the number of visits to assess an insured for a diagnosis of a condition and to require health insurance coverage for consultations with certain health care providers during the assessment for a diagnosis of a condition and after a diagnosis of a mental or nervous condition.
Title
An Act Concerning Benefits Payable For Assessments To Determine A Diagnosis Of A Mental Or Nervous Condition And Related Consultations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6378 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | File Number 42 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 88 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |