CT SB00015 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 39
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 39
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Encouraging Primary And Preventive Care.
Sponsors
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | File Number 39 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 69 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |