CT SB00013 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require any copayment required by an individual or group health insurance policy for prescription drugs to be the same regardless of whether such drugs are obtained through a retail pharmacy or through a mail order pharmacy.
Title
An Act Concerning Copayments For Drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 43 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-22 | File Number 10 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Calendar Number 38 | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/22/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-02-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-08 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-01-21 | Public Hearing 01/25 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2011-01-18 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-14 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |