CT SB00006 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To decrease the time frame for urgent care adverse determination review requests from seventy-two hours to forty-eight hours.
Title
An Act Decreasing The Time Frames For Urgent Care Adverse Determination Review Requests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-01 | Senate | File Number 345 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 251 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |