CT SB00004 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require a study of the public health impact of people not taking their prescription medications, or not taking them as directed, because they cannot afford to pay for them.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Accessibility Of Prescription Drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-21SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-21SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-21SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-16SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-01SenateNo New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-04-30SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 208
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 126
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-13SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback