CT SB00004 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/19
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/19
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit an automobile insurance identification card to be presented electronically to the Commissioner of Motor Vehicles or a law enforcement officer.
Title
An Act Concerning The Electronic Presentation Of Automobile Insurance Identification Cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |