CT HR00007 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-29 - File Number 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-29 - File Number 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Robert Barfield, Et Al. V. Angel Quiros, In His Official Capacity As Commissioner, Connecticut Department Of Correction.
Title
Resolution Approving The Settlement Agreement In Robert Barfield, Et Al. V. Angel Quiros, In His Official Capacity As Commissioner, Connecticut Department Of Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | File Number 2 |
2021-01-29 | House | House Calendar Number 32 |
2021-01-29 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-01-29 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/01/21 5:00 PM |
2021-01-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-01-20 | House | House Favorable |
2021-01-15 | House | Public Hearing 01/20 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed with House Clerks 01/06 |