CT HR00007 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - File Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - File Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Stipulated Judgment In James Horan, Executor For The Estates Of Joseph J. Stavola And Jeanne C. Serocke, And John Stavola, Guardian Of James And William Stavola V. State Of Connecticut.
Title
Resolution Approving The Stipulated Judgment In James Horan, Executor For The Estates Of Joseph J. Stavola And Jeanne C. Serocke, And John Stavola, Guardian Of James And William Stavola V. State Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | File Number 20 |
2018-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 40 |
2018-03-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | House | House Favorable |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |