CT HJ00127 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Norma I. Sanchez-figueroa Of South Windsor To Be A Family Support Magistrate.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Norma I. Sanchez-figueroa Of South Windsor To Be A Family Support Magistrate.
Sponsors
Rep. William Tong [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 520 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Adopted, House |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | House Calendar Number 561 |
2017-05-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-23 | House | Public Hearing 05/22 |