CT HJ00042 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Brett C. Browchuk Of Avon To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Airport Authority.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Brett C. Browchuk Of Avon To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Airport Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 43 PASS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 37 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2017-02-01 | House | Adopted, House |
2017-01-20 | House | House Calendar Number 17 |
2017-01-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-01-20 | House | Public Hearing 01/19 |