CT HB07408 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - File Number 1030
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - File Number 1030
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To diversify municipal revenue options, require a study of the PILOT grants program with respect to certain towns and a study of the property tax exemption for machinery and equipment under subdivision (76) of section 12-81 of the general statutes, and authorize municipalities to opt out of certain provisions related to enterprise zones.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Stormwater Authorities, Studies Of The Pilot Grants Program And A Property Tax Exemption For Machinery And Equipment, And Enterprise Zones.
Sponsors
House Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee | Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Brian Lanoue [R] | Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 227 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | File Number 1030 |
2019-05-31 | House | Senate Calendar Number 644 |
2019-05-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9967 |
2019-05-20 | House | File Number 915 |
2019-05-20 | House | House Calendar Number 622 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-05 | House | Public Hearing 04/10 |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |