CT HB07377 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - File Number 881
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow affected business entities to claim the manufacturing apprenticeship tax credit against the personal income tax or the affected business entity tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Extending The Manufacturing Apprenticeship Tax Credit To Affected Business Entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseFile Number 881
2019-05-15HouseHouse Calendar Number 590
2019-05-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-09HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/14/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-30HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-05HousePublic Hearing 04/10
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback