CT HB07365 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - File Number 584
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - File Number 584
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require certain municipal employers to annually report information concerning collective bargaining, health insurance costs and retirement plan costs to the Office of Policy and Management.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Data Reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 584 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 357 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |