CT HB07298 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require final determinations on certain permits of the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection within ninety days of the submission of such permit applications, including certain solid waste management facilities and publicly owned treatment works, (2) redesignate recyclable items, (3) reallocate department staff resources concerning solid waste management, and (4) revise certain reporting requirements of resources recovery facilities.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force On The Stability Of Recycling In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 198 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | File Number 1009 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 613 |
2019-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9486 |
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 620 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 374 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |