CT HB07287 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend palliative use of marijuana statutes by adding opioid use disorder as a debilitating medical condition and eliminating the qualifying patient and primary caregiver registration certificate fee.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Medical Marijuana Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 617 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 371 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |