CT HB07285 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 413
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 413
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the implementation of the requirements of North Carolina Board of State Dental Examiners v. Federal Trade Commission regarding licensed building trade examining boards established pursuant to title 20 of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study The Licensed Building Trade Examining Boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 413 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 493 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 320 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |