CT HB07178 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To modify when a licensed real estate broker or salesperson must disclose the identity of his or her client to a prospective purchaser or lessee who is not represented by a licensed real estate broker or salesperson.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Disclosures By Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 344 PASS (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseVetoed by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-158
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 383
2019-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 348
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 226
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback