CT HB07122 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent cuts in state reimbursement to a nursing home based on the component of the home's Medicaid rate related to facility property costs.
Title
An Act Concerning Fair Rent For Nursing Homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-30 | House | File Number 327 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 242 |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |