CT HB07117 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - File Number 73
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - File Number 73
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To efficiently organize the Department of Consumer Protection.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 73 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 66 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |