CT HB07092 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - File Number 874
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the number of persons served under the Katie Beckett Waiver Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding The Katie Beckett Waiver Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseFile Number 874
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNew File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-07HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-02HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseFile Number 69
2019-03-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 62
2019-03-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-05HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-05HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback