CT HB07002 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make camera, computer and cellular mobile telephone repair personnel who are eighteen years of age or older mandated reporters of child abuse and neglect.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Camera, Computer And Cellular Mobile Telephone Repair Personnel As Mandated Reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | No Action |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-25 | House | File Number 124 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 102 |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |