CT HB06996 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - File Number 855
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - File Number 855
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish deadlines and penalties with respect to the registration requirement for dry cleaning establishments under the dry cleaning establishment surcharge.
Title
An Act Concerning Registration Requirements Related To The Dry Cleaning Establishment Surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 110 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | File Number 855 |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 533 |
2015-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7199 |
2015-04-28 | House | File Number 750 |
2015-04-28 | House | House Calendar Number 493 |
2015-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |