CT HB06993 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Senate Calendar Number 634
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Senate Calendar Number 634
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) allow mortgage loan originators who have been licensed as a mortgage loan originator in another state or employed as a federal registered loan originator to temporarily act as a mortgage loan originator in this state, and (2) define the circumstances constituting a "change in control" for purposes of filing certain advance change notices with the commissioner.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary Authority To Act As A Mortgage Loan Originator And Defining The Circumstances Constituting A Change Of Control Person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 219 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 634 |
2019-05-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | File Number 245 |
2019-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 163 |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |