CT HB06992 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - File Number 483
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - File Number 483
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the chairperson of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to conduct a study pertaining to telecommunications.
Title
An Act Concerning Telecommunications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | File Number 483 |
2015-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 313 |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |