CT HB06987 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt Social Security income includable for federal income tax purposes from the state income tax.
Title
An Act Exempting Social Security Benefits From State Income Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-02 | House | File Number 11 |
2017-03-02 | House | House Calendar Number 39 |
2017-03-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/01/17 5:00 PM |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |