CT HB06977 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Veto Sustained, House
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Veto Sustained, House
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish qualifications for the position of Commissioner of Education.
Title
An Act Establishing Qualifications For The Commissioner Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 379 (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 68) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 417 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 111 (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 417 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 111 (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | House | Veto Sustained, House |
2015-07-20 | House | House Reconsidered Bill |
2015-06-30 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Act 15-176 |
2015-06-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 530 |
2015-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | File Number 481 |
2015-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 311 |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |